EP0597781 - Flat sheet die for the extrusion of plastic films, struts or panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LES PLASTIQUES DE LA DEOME Route Nationale F-42220 Bourg Argental / FR | [1994/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonnel, Pierre 9, rue de Chadet F-42290 Sorbiers / FR | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Perrier, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 rue de la République 42000 St-Etienne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | Perrier, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 rue de la République F-42000 St-Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 93420446.2 | 09.11.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | FR19920013796 | 10.11.1992 Original published format: FR 9213796 | [1994/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597781 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597781 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/14 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
B29C48/305 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/20] | Title | German: | Breitschlitzdüse zur Film-, Folien- oder Plattenextrusion | [1994/20] | English: | Flat sheet die for the extrusion of plastic films, struts or panels | [1994/20] | French: | Filière plate pour l'extrusion de film, feuille ou plaque en matière synthétique | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/24] | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPS63256418 ; | [A]JPS57100032 ; | [Y]US2628386 (TORNBERG HENNING T) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 22 - line 29; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 53 - line 57; figure 3 *; | [A]US2813301 (MURRAY UNDERWOOD WILLIAM) [A] 2-5 * column 1, line 64 - line 69; figure 2 * * column 2, line 3 - line 16; figure 1 * * column 2, line 21 - line 23 *; | [A]US2897541 (DANTE ORSINI CAMILLO) [A] 5,6 * column 2, line 39 - line 41; figure 1 * * column 3, line 13 - line 21; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US3000054 (WALTER SEIFRIED, et al) [A] 2 * column 2, line 14 - line 22; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3085289 (RIPER JURIAN W VAN) [A] 1 * column 5, line 24 - line 28; figure 3 *; | [A]US3133313 (CORBETT HERBERT O) [A] 1 * column 2, line 8 - line 12; figure 1 *; | [A]US3191228 (WERNER SCHLUTER) [A] 2-4 * column 2, line 22 - line 54; figure - *; | [A]FR2351776 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1* page 9, line 15 - line 36; figure 5 * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890207), vol. 13, no. 52, Database accession no. (M - 794)<3400>, & JP63256418 A 19881024 (TORAY IND INC) [DY] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821002), vol. 6, no. 193, Database accession no. (M - 160)<1071>, & JP57100032 A 19820622 (SEKISUI KASEIHIN KOGYO K.K.) [A] 6 * abstract * |