EP0660569 - Method and system for improving the processing time of the path selection in a high speed packet switching network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1996 | Change - applicant | published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertin, Olivier 53, Bd de Montréal F-06200 Nice / FR | 02 /
Mauerl, Olivier 15, rue Forville F-06110 Le Cannet / FR | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 93480231.5 | 22.12.1993 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660569 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
H04L45/122 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L45/243 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Verbessern der Verarbeitungszeit der Wegeauswahl in einem Hochgeschwindigkeits-Paketvermittlungsnetz | [1995/26] | English: | Method and system for improving the processing time of the path selection in a high speed packet switching network | [1995/26] | French: | Procédé et système pour améliorer le temps de traitement de la sélection de route dans un réseau de commutation de paquets à grande vitesse | [1995/26] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 24.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 28.10.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0568477 (IBM [US]) [DX] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 2 * * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 13 * * claims 1,2 ** figures 5-7 * | [A] - J.S. MEDITCH ET AL., "MINIMUM FLOW HOP ASSIGNEMT AND ROUTING SUBJECT TO AND AVERAGE MESSAGE DELAY CONSTRAINT", COMPUTERS AND ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING, USA, (1983), vol. 10, no. 10, pages 183 - 190 [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] * |