EP0589818 - Microorganisms and process for the biological removal of nitrated derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/13] | Process for the biological removal of nitrated derivatives | ||
[1998/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION ESPANOLA DE EXPLOSIVOS S.A. Claudio Coello 124 E-28006 Madrid / ES | [1994/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramos Martin, Juan Luis Los Rosales 14 E-18191 Pindos Genil (Granada) / ES | 02 /
Duque Martin de Oliva, Estrella Los Rosales 14 E-18191 Pindos Genil (Granada) / ES | [1994/13] | Representative(s) | Garcia Cabrerizo, Francisco OFICINA GARCIA CABRERIZO S.L. Vitruvio 23 28006 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1994/13] | Garcia Cabrerizo, Francisco OFICINA GARCIA CABRERIZO S.L. Vitruvio 23 E-28006 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 93500100.8 | 09.07.1993 | [1994/13] | Priority number, date | ES19920001436 | 10.07.1992 Original published format: ES 9201436 | [1994/13] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0589818 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0589818 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0589818 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/02, C02F3/34, B09B3/00, C02F3/12, C12R1/385, C12P1/04, // C12R1/38 | [1995/01] | CPC: |
A62D3/02 (EP);
B09C1/10 (EP);
C02F3/1231 (EP);
C02F3/34 (EP);
C12N1/205 (EP);
A62D2101/06 (EP);
A62D2101/26 (EP);
A62D2101/40 (EP);
C02F2101/003 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1994/13] | C02F3/02, C02F3/34, B09B3/00, // C12R1/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1994/13] | Title | German: | Mikroorganismen und Verfahren zur biologischen Entfernung von Nitratderivaten | [1998/37] | English: | Microorganisms and process for the biological removal of nitrated derivatives | [1998/37] | French: | Microorganismes et procédé d'élimination biologique de dérivés de nitrate | [1998/37] |
Former [1994/13] | Verfahren zur biologischen Entfernung von Nitratderivaten | ||
Former [1994/13] | Process for the biological removal of nitrated derivatives | ||
Former [1994/13] | Procédé d'élimination biologique de dérivés de nitrate | Examination procedure | 03.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 29.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.09.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.1993 | 28.09.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   27.10.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 10.12.1998 | [1999/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]WO9219373 (MARTIN MARIETTA ENERGY SYSTEMS [US]) [AP] 1,4 * page 5, line 1 - line 8 *; | [A]WO9115440 (IDAHO RES FOUND [US]) [A] 3,7,13,14 * page 6, line 3 - line 24; claim 11 *; | [A]US5085998 (LEBRON CARMEN A [US], et al) [A] 7,8,13,16 * column W *; | [A]SU1423585 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 12, Database accession no. 89-091696, & SU1423585 A 00000000 (MAKEEVKA ENG. CONS.) [A] 1,4,7 * abstract * |