EP0587541 - Process to purify the big-endothelin protein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECNOGEN S.P.A. Località "La Fagianeria-P.CO SCIENTIFICO" 81015 Piana de Monte Verna (Caserta) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states TECNOGEN S.C.P.A. Località "La Fagianeria-P.CO SCIENTIFICO" 81015 Piana de Monte Verna (Caserta) / IT | ||
Former [1994/11] | For all designated states TECNOGEN S.C.P.A. Località "La Fagianeria-P.CO SCIENTIFICO" I-81015 Piana de Monte Verna, (Caserta) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fassina, Giorgio, c/o TECNOGEN ScpA "La Fagianeria - Parco Scientifico" I-81015 Piana di Monte Verna (CE) / IT | 02 /
Merli, Silvia, c/o TECNOGEN ScpA "La Fagianeria - Parco Scientifico" I-81015 Piana di Monte Verna (CE) / IT | [1994/11] | Representative(s) | de Simone, Domenico, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | de Simone, Domenico, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 I-00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 93830361.7 | 03.09.1993 | [1994/11] | Priority number, date | IT1992RM00658 | 09.09.1992 Original published format: IT RM920658 | [1994/11] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587541 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587541 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/14, C07K1/22, C12N15/10 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/57536 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/11] | C07K3/12, C07K3/20, C12N15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reinigung des Big-Endothelin Proteins | [1994/11] | English: | Process to purify the big-endothelin protein | [1994/11] | French: | Procédé de purification de protéine Big-endothéline | [1994/11] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.05.1998 | BE | 13.05.1998 | ES | 13.05.1998 | GR | 13.05.1998 | PT | 13.08.1998 | LU | 03.09.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 13.05.1998 | |
BE | 13.05.1998 | ||
ES | 13.05.1998 | ||
GR | 13.05.1998 | ||
PT | 13.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 13.05.1998 | |
BE | 13.05.1998 | ||
GR | 13.05.1998 | ||
PT | 13.08.1998 | ||
LU | 30.09.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 13.05.1998 | |
BE | 13.05.1998 | ||
PT | 13.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 13.05.1998 | |
BE | 13.05.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 13.05.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0147819 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]WO9002179 (LIFECODES CORP [US]) | [AD] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 110, no. 4, October 1991 H. OHASHI et al. "Synthesis of Human Big Endothelin-1 by Sequence-Specific Proteolysis of a Fusion Protein in Escherichia coli" pages 628-634 | Examination | - THE JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 110, no. 4, October 1991, H. OHASHI et al., pp. 628-634 |