EP0606830 - Process for the manufacture of a fibre-reinforced resin preimpregnated sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GFM Gesellschaft für Fertigungstechnik und Maschinenbau Aktiengesellschaft Ennserstrasse 14 4403 Steyr / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states GFM Gesellschaft für Fertigungstechnik und Maschinenbau Aktiengesellschaft Ennserstrasse 14 A-4403 Steyr / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blaimschein, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Arnhalmw. 33 A-4403 Steyr / AT | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 93890005.7 | 15.01.1993 | [1994/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0606830 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/14 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
B26D7/2628 (EP,US);
B26D11/00 (EP);
B29C70/202 (EP);
B29C70/30 (EP,US);
B29C2793/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Prepregplatte aus faserverstärktem Kunststoff | [1994/29] | English: | Process for the manufacture of a fibre-reinforced resin preimpregnated sheet | [1994/29] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une plaque préimprégnée plastique renforcée de fibres | [1994/29] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 30.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 01.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/04] | 28.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1364076 (BRITISH AIRCRAFT CORP LTD); | [A]EP0361796 (TECH TEXTILES LTD [GB]); | [A]FR2673573 (INVERTIGACION IND TEX ASOC [ES], et al) |