EP0623004 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McMAHON, Michael John 5 Foxhill Crescent Leeds West Yorkshire LS16 5PD / GB | For all designated states MORAN, Peter 31 Spring Valley Drive Leeds West Yorkshire LS13 4RN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states McMAHON, Michael John 5 Foxhill Cresent Leeds, West Yorkshire LS16 5PD / GB | ||
For all designated states MORAN, Peter 31 Spring Valley Drive Leeds, West Yorkshire LS13 4RN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/45] | Representative(s) | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh, et al 15 Clare Road Yorkshire Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/45] | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh, et al Appleyard, Lees & Co. 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 93901858.6 | 13.01.1993 | [1994/45] | WO1993GB00064 | Priority number, date | GB19920001214 | 21.01.1992 Original published format: GB 9201214 | GB19920016233 | 30.07.1992 Original published format: GB 9216233 | [1994/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9313713 | Date: | 22.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0623004 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0623004 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02, A61B17/00 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
A61B17/0218 (EP);
A61B17/00234 (EP);
A61B2017/2904 (EP);
A61B2017/2905 (EP);
A61M2025/0161 (EP);
A61M2025/0163 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/45] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE INSTRUMENTE | [1994/45] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENTS | [1994/45] | French: | INSTRUMENTS CHIRURGICAUX | [1994/45] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/45] | 03.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4754909 ; | [X]US4239036 ; | [X]DE4021153 |