EP0583449 - BENDING PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRIEBEL, Edgar Andreas-Grieser-Strasse 77 D-97084 Würzburg / DE | [1994/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/08] | Representative(s) | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Patentanwalt Dr. W. Pöhner Kaiserstrasse 33 Postfach 6323 97013 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton, Dr. Kaiserstrasse 27 Postfach 63 23 D-97013 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93903803.0 | 18.02.1993 | [1994/08] | WO1993DE00139 | Priority number, date | DE19924206417 | 29.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4206417 | [1994/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9316822 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0583449 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/04 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
B21D5/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/08] | Title | German: | SCHWENKBIEGEMASCHINE | [1994/08] | English: | BENDING PRESS | [1994/08] | French: | PRESSE A PLIER | [1994/08] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 02.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/09] | 02.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.12.1993 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.1993 | 06.12.1993 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.1993 | 06.12.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.1993 | 06.12.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.1993 | 06.12.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.1993 | 06.12.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.1993 | 06.12.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.1993 | 06.12.1993 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.1993 | 06.12.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.1993 | 06.12.1993 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.12.1993 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.04.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   20.05.1994 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2307592 ; | [Y]DE8600539U ; | [Y]WO8705838 ; | [Y]US3344633 ; | [A]EP0258204 ; | [A]US4901555 ; | [A]CH475803 |