EP0627133 - FAULT-CURRENT PROTECTIVE SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/49] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POHL, Felix Leuschnerweg 16 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1994/49] | Application number, filing date | 93903806.3 | 18.02.1993 | [1994/49] | WO1993DE00142 | Priority number, date | DE19924205208 | 20.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4205208 | [1994/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9317479 | Date: | 02.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0627133 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627133 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/16 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
H02H3/332 (EP);
H02H3/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/49] | Title | German: | FEHLERSTROMSCHUTZSCHALTER | [1994/49] | English: | FAULT-CURRENT PROTECTIVE SWITCH | [1994/49] | French: | DISJONCTEUR DE COURANT DE FUITE | [1994/49] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/49] | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3537140 (TURCK WERNER KG [DE]) |