EP0642380 - REDUCING PROCEEDING AND/OR A SYSTEM TO INTERMIX AND MEANS FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 28.04.1999 [1999/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOTHIA TOOL TRADING HB Lilla Gardskullavägen 5 S-434 00 Kungsbacka / SE | [1995/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SVENDSSEN, Allan Lilla Gardskullavägen 5 S-434 00 Kungsbacka / SE | [1995/11] | Representative(s) | RACKETTE Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 13 10 79013 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | RACKETTE Partnerschaft Patentanwälte Postfach 13 10 79013 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1995/11] | Rackette, Karl, Dipl.-Phys. Dr.-Ing Postfach 1310 D-79013 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93910538.3 | 18.05.1993 | [1995/11] | WO1993SE00436 | Priority number, date | SE19920001554 | 18.05.1992 Original published format: SE 9201554 | [1995/11] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323147 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0642380 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
B01D53/74 (EP);
C10L10/02 (EP);
C10L10/04 (EP);
F23G5/32 (EP);
F23J7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/11] | Title | German: | REDUKTIONSVERFAHREN UND/ODER MISCHSYSTEM UND MITTEL DAZU | [1995/11] | English: | REDUCING PROCEEDING AND/OR A SYSTEM TO INTERMIX AND MEANS FOR THE SAME | [1995/11] | French: | PROCEDE REDUCTEUR ET/OU SYSTEME DE MELANGE AINSI QUE LEURS MOYENS | [1995/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1994 | Translation filed | 05.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 05.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1999/17] | 25.11.1998 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.12.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9117814 ; | [X]DE3340892 ; | [EX]EP0512156 ; | [A]EP0426978 |