EP0671948 - VACCINE COMPOSITION CONTAINING ADJUVANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Biologicals S.A. 89 rue de l'Institut 1330 Rixensart / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOGICALS s.a. 89 rue de l'Institut B-1330 Rixensart / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIEELS, Jean-Paul SmithKline Beecham Biologicals (S.A.) 89, rue de l'Institut, B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 02 /
GARCON-JOHNSON, Nathalie Marie-Josephe Claude SmithKline Beecham Biologicals (S.A.) 89, rue de l'Institut, B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 03 /
SLAOUI, Moncef SmithKline Beecham Biologicals (S.A.) 89, rue de l'Institut, B-1330 Rixensart / BE | 04 /
PALA, Pietro SmithKline Beecham Biologicals (S.A.) 89, rue de l'Institut, B-1330 Rixensart / BE | [1995/38] | Representative(s) | Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William, et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93912990.4 | 15.06.1993 | [1995/38] | WO1993EP01524 | Priority number, date | GB19920013559 | 25.06.1992 Original published format: GB 9213559 | GB19920026283 | 17.12.1992 Original published format: GB 9226283 | GB19930004056 | 01.03.1993 Original published format: GB 9304056 | [1995/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9400153 | Date: | 06.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671948 | Date: | 20.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0671948 | Date: | 13.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39, A61K39/00, // A61K39/245, A61K39/295 | [1995/38] | CPC: |
A61K39/292 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/00 (KR);
A61K39/015 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/245 (EP,US);
A61K39/29 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55572 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55577 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/38] | Title | German: | ADJUVANTIEN ENTHALTENDE IMPFSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1997/33] | English: | VACCINE COMPOSITION CONTAINING ADJUVANTS | [1995/38] | French: | COMPOSITION VACCINALE CONTENANT DES ADJUVANTS | [1995/38] |
Former [1995/38] | ADJUVANTIEN ANTHLATNEDE IMPFSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/03: Teilanmeldung 96203085.4 eingereicht am 05/11/96 | EPB 1997/03: Divisional application 96203085.4 filed on 05/11/96 | EPB 1997/03: Demande divisionnaire 96203085.4 déposée le 05/11/96 | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/38] | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96203085.4 / EP0761231 | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - BIOTECHNOLOGY vol. 20, 1992, pages 431 - 449 ANTHONY C. ALLISON ET AL. 'IMMUNOLOGICAL ADJUVANTS AND THEIR MODE OF ACTION' | [A] - J. ANIMAL SCIENCE vol. 68, 1990, pages 3742 - 3746 A. J. ROBERTS ET AL. 'ACTIVE IMMUNIZATION OF BEEF HEIFERS AGAINST LUTEINIZING HORMONE...' |