EP0664187 - GRINDING TAPE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIO, Toshikazu Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | 02 /
AMEMIYA, Hiroyuki Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | 03 /
NAKAI, Yasuo Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | 04 /
ISHII, Taiji Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | 05 /
YAMAGUCHI, Masahisa Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/30] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93913473.0 | 02.06.1993 | [1995/30] | WO1993JP00743 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9427787 | Date: | 08.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664187 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664187 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B24D11/00 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
B24D11/001 (EP,US);
B24D11/00 (EP,KR,US);
B24D11/005 (EP,US);
B24D3/28 (EP,US);
H03M13/41 (EP,US);
H03M13/6331 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1995/30] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFBAND UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1995/30] | English: | GRINDING TAPE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [1995/30] | French: | BANDE ABRASIVE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1995/30] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1995 | Translation filed | 24.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1995 | Search fee paid | 24.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 06.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99105023.8 / EP0938950 | EP99105024.6 / EP0940224 | EP99105025.3 / EP0938951 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH01171771 (HAI CONTROL LTD); | [Y]JPH01149263U ; | [Y]JPH0283172 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JPH02256467 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) |