EP0641249 - SUPPORTED MICROPOROUS MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Costar Corporation One Alewife Center Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states COSTAR CORPORATION One Alewife Center Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PACHECO, Manuel, M. 12 Brookside Drive Billerica, MA 01821 / US | 02 /
PACHECO, John, F. 3 Belmont Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Fry, Alan Valentine, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Fry, Alan Valentine, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 93913949.9 | 18.05.1993 | [1995/10] | WO1993US04685 | Priority number, date | US19920884832 | 18.05.1992 Original published format: US 884832 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323153 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641249 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/10, B01D67/00, B01D71/34 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
B01D71/34 (EP,US);
B01D69/1071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/10] | Title | German: | GESTÜTZTE MIKROPORÖSE MEMBRANE | [1995/10] | English: | SUPPORTED MICROPOROUS MEMBRANES | [1995/10] | French: | MEMBRANES MICROPOREUSES SOUTENUES | [1995/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/12] | 16.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4071590 (STRATHMANN HEINRICH); | [A]EP0185373 (PALL CORP [US]); | [A]EP0245863 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]); | [A]US4806291 (SUSA THOMAS J [US]) |