EP0619104 - ULTRASONIC IRRADIATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/41] | ULTRASONIC IRRADIATION APPARATUS AND PROCESSOR USING THE SAME | ||
[2001/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UMEMURA, Shinichiro 3-6-18, Akatsukicho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192 / JP | 02 /
KAWABATA, Kenichi Hitachi Hatoyamaryo 2527, Akanuma Hatoyamamachi Hiki-gun Saitama 350-03 / JP | 03 /
UCHIDA, Kenko 2-23, Hitachi Hatoyama Hausu 2528, Akanuma Hatoyamamachi Hiki-gun Saitama 350-03 / JP | 04 /
YASUDA, Kenji Hitachi Hatoyamaryo 2527, Akanuma Hatoyamamachi, Hiki-gun Saitama 350-03 / JP | 05 /
WADA, Yasuo 6-14-5, Otsuka Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112 / JP | 06 /
HIRAIWA, Atsushi 2-21-10, Suwacho Higashimurayama-shi Tokyo 189 / JP | [1994/41] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93919658.0 | 14.09.1993 | [1994/41] | WO1993JP01310 | Priority number, date | JP19920246179 | 16.09.1992 Original published format: JP 24617992 | [1994/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9406380 | Date: | 31.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0619104 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0619104 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.03.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61N7/00 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
A61N7/02 (EP,US);
A61B17/22004 (EP,US);
A61N2007/006 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0078 (EP,US);
A61N2007/0095 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/19] | A61F7/00, A61B17/22, A61B17/36, B06B1/02, B01J19/10, B08B3/12, A61L2/02, A23C3/07, C02F1/36 | ||
Former IPC [1994/41] | A61F7/00, A61B17/22, A61B17/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1994/41] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLBESTRAHLUNGSGERAET | [2001/13] | English: | ULTRASONIC IRRADIATION APPARATUS | [2001/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IRRADIATION ULTRASONORE | [2001/13] |
Former [1994/41] | ULTRASCHALLBESTRAHLUNGSGERAET UND DARAUF BASIERENDES BEHANDLUNGSGERAET | ||
Former [1994/41] | ULTRASONIC IRRADIATION APPARATUS AND PROCESSOR USING THE SAME | ||
Former [1994/41] | DISPOSITIF D'IRRADIATION ULTRASONORE ET PROCESSEUR L'UTILISANT | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.1994 | Translation filed | 20.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.1994 | Search fee paid | 20.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 26.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3991933 (ANTONEVICH JOHN N) [A] 1,9,16,23 * column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB1389291 (TELECOMMUNICATIONS IND) [A] 16,23 * page 3, line 45 - page 4, line 40; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4375991 (SACHS SAMUEL L, et al) [A] 16,23 * column 6, line 46 - column 11, line 41; figures 1-5 *; | [A] - ADLER L ET AL, "Excitation of fractional harmonic ultrasonic waves", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON ACOUSTICS 18-26 AUG. 1971, BUDAPEST, HUNGARY, AKADEMIAI KIADO, pages 193 - 196, XP000564800 [A] 1,9,16,23 * page 193 - page 195; figures 1-4 * | [A] - MILLER D L, "Ultrasonic detection of resonant cavitation bubbles in a flow tube by their second-harmonic emmisions.", ULTRASONICS (UK), UK, vol. 19, no. 5, pages 217 - 224, XP000560643 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0041-624X(81)90006-8 | International search | [Y]JPH02126848 (HITACHI LTD) | Examination | EP0351610 |