|
23.04.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2006 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2006 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.09.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
15 |
|
25.08.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2005 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Description |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.2005 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
6 |
|
15.04.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
09.03.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.02.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.01.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2004 |
F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.10.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.12.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.10.2001 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2001 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.06.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.05.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.03.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.11.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.10.2000 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.12.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1999 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1999 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.09.1998 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
25.05.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
29.09.1997 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
14.11.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
22.02.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
22.02.1996 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.02.1996 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
11.10.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
08.08.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.1995 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1995 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1995 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.08.1994 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.1994 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.1994 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.1994 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.1994 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
11.05.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |