EP0609796 - Hairbleaching composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädter Str. 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2003/12] |
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states GOLDWELL GmbH Zerninstrasse 10-18 D-64297 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states GOLDWELL AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zerninstrasse 10-18 D-64297 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorenz, Heribert Ober-Ramstädter Strasse 22 D-64401 Gross-Bieberau / DE | 02 /
Eberling, Walter Mittelstrasse 1 D-64560 Riedstadt-Crumstadt / DE | 03 /
Simon, Frederic Wilhelm-Leibl-Strasse 4 D-64569 Nauheim / DE | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patent Attorneys, Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner, Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101350.0 | 29.01.1994 | [1994/32] | Priority number, date | DE19934302738 | 01.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4302738 | DE19934329282 | 31.08.1993 Original published format: DE 4329282 | [1994/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0609796 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0609796 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609796 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/135 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
A61Q5/08 (EP);
A61K8/19 (EP);
A61K8/36 (EP);
A61K8/365 (EP);
A61K8/368 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/32] | Title | German: | Blondiermittel für menschliche Haare | [1994/32] | English: | Hairbleaching composition | [1994/32] | French: | Composition pour décoloré des cheveux humains | [1994/32] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.07.1999
13.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE Wella AG Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | 02
02.09.1999
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 03
01.09.1999
ADMISSIBLE L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 PARIS / FR Opponent's representative Bulle, Françoise Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.07.1999
13.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE Wella AG Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | ||
02
02.09.1999
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
03
01.09.1999
ADMISSIBLE L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 PARIS / FR Opponent's representative Bulle, Françoise Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | |||
Former [1999/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.07.1999
13.08.1999
ADMISSIBLE Wella AG Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | 08.10.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.01.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.01.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.12.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2005/11] | 16.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 28.03.2002 | Appeal received No. T0337/02 | 28.03.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.12.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 16.12.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.12.2004 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.12.1998 | IT | 02.12.1998 | CH | 31.01.2000 | LI | 31.01.2000 | NL | 01.08.2000 | DK | 29.01.2002 | AT | 29.01.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/03] | ES | 02.12.1998 | |
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
NL | 01.08.2000 | ||
DK | 29.01.2002 | ||
AT | 29.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 02.12.1998 | |
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
NL | 01.08.2000 | ||
DK | 29.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 02.12.1998 | |
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
NL | 01.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | CH | 31.01.2000 | |
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
NL | 01.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/12] | NL | 01.08.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]NL78053C (N. V. INDUSTIELE ONDERNEMING W. H. BRASKAMP) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1257661 (SAMUEL A.) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2023922 (L'OREAL) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1617829 (SCHWARZKOPF GMBH HANS) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2307596 (WELLA AG) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3814356 (SCHWARZKOPF GMBH HANS [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]GB2242358 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [A] 1-5 * page 28; example 12 * |