EP0628661 - Roadfinisher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joseph Vögele AG Neckarauer Strasse 168-228 D-68199 Mannheim / DE | [1994/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beyse, Volker, Dr.-Ing. Liebermannstrasse 36 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Grundl, Roland, Dipl.-Ing. Dellenweg 11 D-69253 Heiligkreuzsteinach / DE | [1998/06] |
Former [1994/50] | 01 /
Beyse, Volker, Dr-Ing. Liebermannstrasse 36 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | ||
02 /
Grundl, Roland, Dipl. Ing. Dellenweg 11 D-69253 Heiligkreuzsteinach / DE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94103431.6 | 07.03.1994 | [1994/50] | Priority number, date | DE19930008802U | 14.06.1993 Original published format: DE 9308802 U | [1994/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0628661 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0628661 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/48 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
E01C19/48 (EP);
E01C2301/10 (EP);
F02B63/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/50] | Title | German: | Strassenfertiger | [1994/50] | English: | Roadfinisher | [1994/50] | French: | Finisseur | [1994/50] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 13.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0489969 (VOEGELE AG J [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9206935U (VÖGELE) [A] 14 * the whole document * |