EP0689849 - A docking assembly for the extension of a guidewire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider (Europe) GmbH Ackerstrasse 6 8180 Bülach / CH | [1998/22] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER (EUROPE) AG Ackerstrasse 6 CH-8180 Bülach / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwager, Michael Hegifeldstrasse 9 CH-8404 Winterthur / CH | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A. 10, Route de Florissant Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/01] | Kiliaridis, Constantin, et al Bugnion S.A., 10, Route de Florissant, Case Postale 375 1211 Genève 12 / CH | ||
Former [1996/01] | Misrachi, Alfred Alfred MISRACHI, Ingénieur-conseil, Chemin de la Plantaz 15 CH-1024 Ecublens / CH | Application number, filing date | 94105567.5 | 11.04.1994 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0689849 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0689849 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M25/01 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
A61M25/0905 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/01] | Extension states | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Halteverbindung für die Verlängerung eines Führungsdrahtes | [1996/01] | English: | A docking assembly for the extension of a guidewire | [1996/01] | French: | Assemblage de retenue pour l'extension d'un fil de guidage | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1994 | Examination requested [1996/01] | 12.04.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR, LU, MC, PT | 08.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.05.1995 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.1995 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.1995 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.1995 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 11.04.2000 | ES | 12.04.2000 | SE | 12.04.2000 | CH | 30.04.2000 | LI | 30.04.2000 | FR | 02.05.2000 | [2011/35] |
Former [2004/28] | DK | 11.04.2000 | |
ES | 12.04.2000 | ||
SE | 12.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | DK | 11.04.2000 | |
SE | 12.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | SE | 12.04.2000 | |
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | SE | 12.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]EP0321796 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [DY] 3,5,9,10 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 20; figures 1-3 * [DA] 1,2; | [DYA]US4917103 (GAMBALE RICHARD A [US], et al) [DY] 3,5,9,10 * column A; figures 2-4 * [DA] 1,2; | [A]US5234002 (CHAN RANDY S [US]) [A] 1-3,6,8* column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 11; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | EP0321796 | US4917103 |