EP0621523 - Method for providing high-precision volumetric flow at low flow rate and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.1998 [1998/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GSF-Forschungszentrum für Umwelt und Gesundheit GmbH Ingolstädter Landstrasse 1 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states GSF-Forschungszentrum für Umwelt und Gesundheit, GmbH Ingolstädter Landstrasse 1 D-85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Karl-Heinz Im Gries 17 D-83620 Feldkirchen-Westerham / DE | 02 /
Menache, Georg, Dr. Ponkratzstrasse 36 D-80995 München / DE | 03 /
Frisch, Heinz Krenmoosstrasse 57 D-85757 Karlsfeld / DE | [1994/43] | Application number, filing date | 94105850.5 | 15.04.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | DE19934312995 | 21.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4312995 | [1994/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0621523 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0621523 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/06, F04B49/06 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
B01L3/0293 (EP);
F04B11/0058 (EP);
G05D7/0682 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/43] | G05D7/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung von hochpräzischen Volumenströmen bei geringer Flussrate und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1994/43] | English: | Method for providing high-precision volumetric flow at low flow rate and apparatus therefor | [1994/43] | French: | Procédé pour fournir des flux volumétriques très précis à des petits débits et dispositif pour sa mise en oeuvre | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/02] | 25.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0084070 (POLAROID) [A] 1-3 * page 4, line 1 - page 15, line 27; figures 1-4 *; | [PA]EP0562398 (FRIEDRICH WILH.SCHWING GMBH) [PA] 1-3 * page 4, line 53 - page 10, line 5; figures 1-12 *; | [PA]EP0567826 (ABEL-PUMPEN GMBH) [PA] 1-3 * column 2, line 1 - column 6, line 44; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2580833 (GIRA SA) [A] 1-3,5 * page 3, line 7 - page 6, line 32; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE4130295 (BLÜCHER) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 34 - column 6, line 40; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4770168 (RUSZ ET AL) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 40 - column 6, line 10; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5026255 (CARPENTER ET AL) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 65 - column 8, line 46; figures 1-5 * |