EP0688578 - Arrhythmia detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 171 95 Solna / SE | [1999/45] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mund, Konrad, Dr. rer. nat. Langenbrucker Weg 10 D-91080 Uttenreuth / DE | 02 /
Stroetmann, Brigitte, Dr. rer. nat. Schleifweg 19 D-91080 Uttenreuth / DE | 03 /
Kallert, Siegfried, Prof. Dr. med. Ebrardstrasse 19 D-91054 Erlangen / DE | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm, et al Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm, et al H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 94109833.7 | 24.06.1994 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688578 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0688578 | Date: | 10.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/362, A61N1/39 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
A61N1/36114 (EP,US);
A61B5/388 (US);
A61B5/4836 (EP,US);
A61N1/36135 (EP,US);
A61N1/362 (EP,US);
A61N1/39622 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | Arrhythmiedetektor | [1995/52] | English: | Arrhythmia detector | [1995/52] | French: | Détecteur d'arythmie | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/42] | 29.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.09.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 15.09.1995 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 15.09.1995 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 15.09.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 15.09.1995 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 | 15.09.1995 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 10.11.1999 | SE | 10.11.1999 | GB | 24.06.2000 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 10.11.1999 | |
GB | 24.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/28] | GB | 24.06.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0469817 (TELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1,5* page 3, line 42 - page 4, line 9; figure - *; | [AD]EP0532144 (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG [DE]) [AD] 1,3,5 * page 3, column 4, line 32 - page 4, column 6, line 14; figure - *; | [A]US5203326 (COLLINS KENNETH A [AU]) [A] 1,2,5 * column 7, line 41 - column 12, line 36 * * column 19, line 26 - column 24, line 13; figure - *; | [A]US5243980 (MEHRA RAHUL [US]) [A] 1,5 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 4; figure - *; | [A]EP0565909 (SORIN BIOMEDICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,5 * page 5, column 8, line 17 - page 7, column 11, line 29; figure - *; | [AD] - MAX SCHALDACH, Electrotherapy of the Heart, HEIDELBERG, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1992) [AD] 1,5 * page 209, line 1 - page 214, line 10; figure - * | [AD] - TARVER ET AL., "Clinical Experience with a Helical Bipolar Stimulating Lead", PACE, HOUSTON TEXAS, (199210), vol. 15 PII, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1540-8159.1992.tb02933.x, pages 1545 - 1556, XP000672111 [AD] 1,2 * page 1546, line 4 - page 1549, line 47; figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1540-8159.1992.tb02933.x |