EP0635384 - Safety support for tyre tread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | Opposition rejected | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN-MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN - MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN - MICHELIN & CIE 12, Cours Sablon F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Habay, Emmanuel 6, rue Bardoux F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 02 /
Lambert, Guy-Noel 46, rue des Côtes Fleuries F-63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Devaux, Edmond-Yves Michelin & Cie, Service SGD/LG/PI Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 01 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Devaux, Edmond-Yves Michelin & Cie Service SRK. Brevets 23, Place des Carmes F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94110342.6 | 04.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | FR19930008932 | 19.07.1993 Original published format: FR 9308932 | [1995/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635384 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635384 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60C17/06 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
B60C17/06 (EP,US);
B60C2017/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/04] | Title | German: | Stützvorrichtung für eine Reifenlauffläche | [1997/30] | English: | Safety support for tyre tread | [1995/04] | French: | Dispositif de soutien d'une bande de roulement de pneumatique | [1995/04] |
Former [1995/04] | Notlaufring für Reifenlauffläche | Examination procedure | 04.07.1994 | Examination requested [1995/04] | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.09.1998
ADMISSIBLE Continental Aktiengesellschaft Abt. Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 1 69 30001 Hannover / DE | [1998/46] | 06.11.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.02.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 11.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.03.2000 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 02.04.2000 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58185305 ; | [A]DE1480805 (LINDLEY WILLIAM LUTHER) [A] 6 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]GB2084088 (MOTOR WHEEL CORP) [AD] 1 * page 2, column L, line 50 - column R, line 76; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4393911 (WINFIELD MASON C) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0159274 (HUTCHINSON SA [FR]) [A] 1* figures 14-16; claim 44 *; | [A]DE3703446 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 36-49; figure -; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840207), vol. 8, no. 28, Database accession no. (M - 274), & JP58185305 A 19831029 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND. LTD.) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |