|
05.09.2002 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2002 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.06.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.2002 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
25.03.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.09.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2001 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.09.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.04.1999 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.04.1999 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1999 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1999 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.1999 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1998 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.1998 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.05.1998 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.05.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1997 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.02.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.02.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.04.1996 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1995 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.1995 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.07.1995 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.1995 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1994 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
06.07.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |