|
08.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2009 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2009 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.2009 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
26 |
|
21.04.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.03.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
55 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
55 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2009 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.03.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.03.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
29.01.2007 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.01.2007 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.01.2007 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
15.09.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
02.08.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.05.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.05.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.03.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.2004 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2004 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.12.2003 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.08.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.10.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.06.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
31.05.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.1999 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
15.07.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.02.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.10.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.08.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.11.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.11.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.11.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.06.1996 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
13.12.1995 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.07.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
23.07.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1994 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.07.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |