|
26.09.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2002 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.2002 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2002 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.07.2002 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2002 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2002 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2001 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.11.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2001 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2001 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2001 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.07.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.12.2000 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.09.2000 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2000 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.2000 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.07.2000 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2000 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
31.07.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.03.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.02.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1999 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.01.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1998 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1998 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1998 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.1998 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1997 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.06.1997 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1997 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.05.1997 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.01.1997 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.1996 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.08.1996 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1996 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.08.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.07.1996 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.09.1994 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
19.08.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.08.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1994 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |