EP0638997 - Servo circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishihara, Masaaki c/o Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1995/07] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Michael John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | Nicholls, Michael John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 94113117.9 | 22.08.1991 | [1995/07] | Priority number, date | JP19900223560 | 24.08.1990 Original published format: JP 22356090 | JP19900236390 | 06.09.1990 Original published format: JP 23639090 | JP19900236389 | 06.09.1990 Original published format: JP 23638990 | [1995/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638997 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0638997 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/00, H03G3/20 | [1995/07] | CPC: |
H03F3/72 (EP,US);
H03G3/20 (KR);
H03G1/04 (EP,US);
H03G3/00 (EP,US);
H03G3/3005 (EP,US);
H03K17/667 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/07] | Title | German: | Steuerschaltung | [1995/07] | English: | Servo circuit | [1995/07] | French: | Circuit de commande | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1994 | Examination requested [1995/07] | 15.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91307759.0 / EP0473370 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3879674 (DRAGON THOMAS J) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 42; figure - *; | [A]GB1568513 (SECR DEFENCE) [A] 1-4* page 2, line 30 - line 39; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4297645 (TANAKA KOUICHI, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 13 - column 6, line 21; figures 2-5 *; | [A]EP0086514 (TRT TELECOM RADIO ELECTR [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 27 - page 6, line 32; figure - * |