EP0705906 - Cooling plate for shaft furnaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/21] |
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1996/15] | For all designated states MAN Gutehoffnungshütte Aktiengesellschaft Bahnhofstrasse 66 D-46145 Oberhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hille, Ing. Hartmut Dürerstrasse 142 D-47447 Moers-Schwafheim / DE | 02 /
Otremba, Ing. Werner Elsternstrasse 32 D-46145 Oberhausen / DE | [1996/15] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [1999/13] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94115821.4 | 07.10.1994 | [1996/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0705906 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0705906 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C21B7/10 | [1996/15] | CPC: |
C21B7/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1996/15] | Title | German: | Kühlplatte für Schachtöfen | [1996/15] | English: | Cooling plate for shaft furnaces | [1996/15] | French: | Plaque de refroidissement pour fours à cuve | [1996/15] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 15.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0029416 (IMPIANTI INDUSTRIALI SPA [IT]) [A] 1* figures 1-7; claim 1 *; | [AD]DE2907511 (KABEL- UND METALLWERKE GUTEHOFFNUNGSHÜTTE ET AL.) [AD] 1 * figures 1-5; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0430740 (CHAVANNE KETIN [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 * | [A] - A. D. NASH, "Stave utilization ......", IRON AND STEEL ENGINEER, PITTSBURGH US, (199212), vol. 69, no. 12, pages 26 - 29 [A] 1 | [A] - P. HEINRICH ET AL., "Hochofenpanzerkühlung .........", STAHL UND EISEN, DüSSELDORF, DE, (19860310), vol. 106, no. 5, pages 205 - 210 [A] 1 |