EP0653427 - Galanthamine derivatives, a process for their preparation and their use as medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC. Route 202 - 206 Bridgewater, NJ 08807-0800 / US | [2002/21] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states AVENTIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati OH 45215-6300 / US | ||
Former [1996/50] | For all designated states HOECHST MARION ROUSSEL, Inc. Kansas City, Missouri 64137-1405 / US | ||
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states HOECHST-ROUSSEL PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED P.O. Box 2500, Route 202-206 Somerville, NJ 08876-1258 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosley, Raymond W., Jr. 659 Cedarbrook Rd. Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | 02 /
Davis, Larry P.O. Box 129, Bird Lane Sergeantsville, NJ 08557 / US | 03 /
Taberna, Veronica 1040 Warren Avenue Union, NJ 07083 / US | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Wein, Elmar Michael, et al Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Global Intellectual Property Department Industriepark Höchst Gebäude K 703 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Wein, Elmar Michael, et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 94115959.2 | 10.10.1994 | [1995/20] | Priority number, date | US19930137440 | 15.10.1993 Original published format: US 137440 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653427 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653427 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/06, A61K31/55, // (C07D491/06, 307:00, 223:00) | [1995/20] | CPC: |
C07D491/10 (EP,US);
C07D491/04 (KR);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D491/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/20] | Title | German: | Galanthamin Derivate, ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Medikamente | [2000/41] | English: | Galanthamine derivatives, a process for their preparation and their use as medicaments | [1995/20] | French: | Dérivés de la galanthamine, procédé pour leur préparation et utilisation comme médicaments | [1995/20] |
Former [1995/20] | Glanthamin Derivate, ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Medikamente | Examination procedure | 17.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 29.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00107570.4 / EP1020470 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0236684 (BONNIE DAVIS) [A] 1,8,9 * column 2, line 24 - line 27 *; | [A]WO8808708 (BONNIE DAVIS [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * pages 5,6,16 *; | NL8800350 [ ] (STICHTING BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH); | [A]WO9220327 (SNORRASON ERNIR [IS]) [A] 1,8,9 * page 43; claim 20 *; | [A]EP0535645 (HOECHST ROUSSEL PHARMA [US]) [A] 1,8,9* compounds IIIa,Va,VIIa * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900326), vol. 112, no. 13, Database accession no. 112096y [A] 1,8,9 * abstract * | [A] - THE MERCK INDEX 10TH EDITION, 1983 RAHWAY, N.J., U.S.A., MERCK & CO., INC. [A] 1,8,9 * No. 4210 * |