EP0655317 - Rapid prototyping method for separating a part from a support structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRATASYS INC. 14950 Martin Drive Eden Prairie Minnesota 55344-2020 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states STRATASYS INC. 14950 Martin Drive Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55344-2020 / US | ||
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states STRATASYS Inc. 14950 Martin Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344-2020 / US | ||
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ciccolo, Arthur Charles 153 Armand Road Ridgefield, Connecticut 06877 / US | 02 /
Kaul, Anil 21 Biltom Road White Plains, New York 10607 / US | 03 /
Korein, James U. 8 Berry Brook Circle Chapüaqua, New York 10514 / US | [1995/22] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [1995/28] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1995/22] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 94116244.8 | 14.10.1994 | [1995/22] | Priority number, date | US19930146855 | 03.11.1993 Original published format: US 146855 | [1995/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0655317 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00 | [1995/22] | CPC: |
G05B19/4099 (EP,US);
B29C64/40 (EP);
B33Y40/20 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35014 (EP);
G05B2219/49038 (EP);
G05B2219/49039 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/22] | Title | German: | Schnelles Prototypenherstellungsverfahren zum Trennen eines Teiles von einer Stützstruktur | [1995/22] | English: | Rapid prototyping method for separating a part from a support structure | [1995/22] | French: | Procédé pour l'obtention rapide de prototypes pour la separation d'une structurede support | [1995/22] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 01.12.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/46] | 23.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0416124 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 8, line 19 - line 38 ** column 19, line 20 - column 24, line 12 * |