EP0655701 - Identifying mark working with surface acoustic waves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2000 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Magori, Valentin, Dipl.-Phys. Limburgstrasse 17 D-81539 München / DE | 02 /
Talke, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Karl-Zerbst-Strasse 26 D-38889 Blankenburg/Harz / DE | [1995/22] | Application number, filing date | 94116925.2 | 26.10.1994 | [1995/22] | Priority number, date | DE19934336504 | 26.10.1993 Original published format: DE 4336504 | [1995/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0655701 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0655701 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0655701 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/02, G06K7/10, G01V15/00 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
G06K19/067 (EP);
G06K7/10009 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/22] | G06K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/22] | Title | German: | Mit akustischen Oberflächenwellen arbeitende Identifizierungsmarke | [1995/22] | English: | Identifying mark working with surface acoustic waves | [1995/22] | French: | Marque d'identification fonctionnant avec des ondes acoustiques de surface | [1995/22] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 23.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02] | Request for further processing for: | 08.10.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 08.10.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 26.01.2000 | SE | 26.01.2000 | PT | 26.04.2000 | [2002/26] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 26.01.2000 | |
PT | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | PT | 26.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4209783 (AONO MASANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1 *; | [A]US4746830 (HOLLAND WILLIAM R [US]) |