EP0661892 - Portable information equipment system and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsunoda, Kazuyuki, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/27] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94120678.1 | 27.12.1994 | [1995/27] | Priority number, date | JP19930334559 | 28.12.1993 Original published format: JP 33455993 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0661892 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0661892 | Date: | 26.02.1997 | [1997/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/14, G08B3/10 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
H04W52/029 (EP,US);
H04B15/04 (EP,US);
H04W88/022 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [1995/27] | Title | German: | Tragbares Informationsgerät, System und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | [1995/27] | English: | Portable information equipment system and control method thereof | [1995/27] | French: | Dispositif d'information portable, système et méthode de commande du dispositif | [1995/27] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/11] | 05.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 27.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JPH05153029 ; | [Y]US4384361 (MASAKI MASARU [JP]) [Y] 3,7,11,14,17 * column 2, line 23 - column 2, line 54 * * column 3, line 13 - column 3, line 39 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4839639 (SATO TOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 4,8,12,15,20-24* column 5, line 15 - column 5, line 32 *; | [XAY]EP0351230 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10,13,16,18,19 * column 3, line 11 - column 3, line 13 * * column 5, line 8 - column 8, line 39 * * abstract * [A] 4,8,12,15,20-24 [Y] 3,7,11,14,17; | [XY]EP0447302 (MATRA COMMUNICATION [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10,16,18,19 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 51 * * abstract * [Y] 3,7,11,14,17 | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930929), vol. 017, no. 542, Database accession no. (E - 1441), & JP05153029 A 19930618 (CASIO COMPUT CO LTD) [XD] 13 * abstract * |