EP0613239 - Audio amplifier arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Janssens, Jan Albert Maria c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Daems, Frank Casimir Hélène c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Dijkmans, Eise Carel c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
van den Homberg, Johannes Aldegonda Theodora Maria c/o Int. Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Groenendaal, Antonius Wilhelmus Maria, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 94200391.4 | 15.02.1994 | [1994/35] | Priority number, date | EP19930200491 | 22.02.1993 Original published format: EP 93200491 | [1994/35] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0613239 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0613239 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/52, H03F1/02 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
H03F1/52 (EP,KR,US);
H03F3/217 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/35] | Title | German: | Audioverstärkeranordnung | [1994/35] | English: | Audio amplifier arrangement | [1994/35] | French: | Montage amplificateur audio | [1994/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/17] | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2250151 (NAD ELECTRONICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US3959736 (GROSJEAN JON PAUL) [A] 1,2 * column W *; | [A]EP0399276 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] 3,4 * abstract * |