EP0685284 - Bench saw workpiece clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chang, Li-Lin No. 5, Lane 76, Hsin-Min St. Tam-Shui Town Taipei Hsien / TW | [N/P] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states Chang, Li-Lin No. 5, Lane 76, Hsin-Min St. Tam-Shui Town, Taipei Hsien / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/49] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1995/49] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Trenité van Doorne, De Lairessestraat 133 NL-1075 HJ Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 94201595.9 | 03.06.1994 | [1995/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685284 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23D51/02, B23D51/04, B25H1/04, B25H1/08, B27G5/02 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
B23D51/02 (EP);
B23D51/04 (EP);
B25H1/04 (EP);
B25H1/08 (EP);
B27G5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/49] | Title | German: | Sägetisch mit Werkstückspannvorrichtung | [1995/49] | English: | Bench saw workpiece clamp | [1995/49] | French: | Table à scie avec dispositif à serrer des pièces | [1995/49] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/28] | 27.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/28] | 12.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4155386 (L.E. ALESSIO) [A] 1 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | AU532153B [ ] (BLACK & DECKER INC); | [A]EP0547016 (NOBEX AB) [A] 1,7,12,14-16 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 49; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0003995 (BLACK & DECKER INC) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [A]DE9104648U (C.-W- CHEN) [A] 5-7,10 * page 3, line 14 - page 8, line 7; figures 1-7 *; | GB2253809 [ ]; | US5259284 [ ]; | [A]EP0222477 (BLACK & DECKER INC) [A] 9 * column 7, line 32 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]GB1422521 (R.P. HICKMAN) [A] 11,13 * page 4, line 104 - line 113; figure 6 *; | [A]DE8533159U (J. SINIKO); | [A]GB1420066 (G.W. WYNN) |