|
11.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.11.2004 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2004 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2004 |
N/A |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.08.2004 |
N/a |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
30.06.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.06.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.03.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.02.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.01.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2002 |
Refund order of filing/examination fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.2002 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.10.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.06.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2002 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.2002 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.10.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.08.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.06.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
12.01.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.1994 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.08.1994 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |