|
11.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2004 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
25.11.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
7 |
|
29.09.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.08.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.10.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.10.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2002 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2002 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2002 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
14 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.11.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.12.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.12.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.09.1998 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1998 |
Deletion of the entry relating to the representative ('et al' case) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1998 |
Request for stay/interruption of the proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1998 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.07.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.1995 |
Reply to communication about intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.07.1995 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.1995 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |