|
31.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
11 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.11.2006 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.11.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.10.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
47 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.09.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.09.2004 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
03.09.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
28.06.2004 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2004 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.01.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2003 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.2003 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.2003 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2003 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.07.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2003 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2003 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2003 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2003 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.05.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2003 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2003 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.11.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.10.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
04.06.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.05.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.11.1998 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1998 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.11.1997 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1997 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1997 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1997 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.1994 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.1994 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.02.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.02.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |