EP0608136 - Pneumatic control valve system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diesel Equipment Limited 139 Laird Drive Toronto Ontario M4G 3V6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states Diesel Equipment Limited 139 Laird Drive Toronto Ontario M4G 3V6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kipling, Graham Victor 28 Cluett Drive Ajax, Ontario L1S 6Z5 / CA | 02 /
Martin, Paul H. 124 Lawrence Crescent Toronto, Ontario, M4N 1N6 / CA | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Pacitti, Pierpaolo Alfonso, et al Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E., et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 94300437.4 | 20.01.1994 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | US19930007954 | 22.01.1993 Original published format: US 7954 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608136 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0608136 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/16, F15B13/042 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
F15B13/0422 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86919 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87056 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87064 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87169 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/30] | Title | German: | Pneumatisches Steuerventil-System | [1994/30] | English: | Pneumatic control valve system | [1994/30] | French: | Système de vanne de commande pneumatique | [1994/30] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 14.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.11.1997 | DE | 13.02.1998 | [2004/35] |
Former [1998/44] | DE | 13.02.1998 | |
FR | 10.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | DE | 13.02.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0125926 (TELEHOIST LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract; page 1, line 5 - page 3, line 4; page 4, line 21 - page 9, line 8; page 10, line 8 - page 12, line 17; figures 1 - 5 *; | [A]EP0471850 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract; column 4, line 49 - column 7, line 1; figures 1 - 3 *; | [A]US4375223 (BAILLIE ROBERT J [AU]) [A] 1 * abstract; column 1, lines 15 - 33; column 2, line41 - column 4, line 2; figues 1 - 5 *; | [DA]US4682621 (KIPLING GRAHAM V [CA]) [DA] 1 * abstract; column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 10; figures 1 - 3 * | Examination | AU1505383 |