EP0614658 - Silicone containing lip care cosmetic composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krzysik, Duane G. 5517 Woodview Pass Midland, Michigan / US | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Vandamme, Luc Johan Roger Dow Corning Limited Cardiff Road Barry South Glamorgan CF63 2YL Wales / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Vandamme, Luc Johan Roger Dow Corning Limited, Cardiff Road Barry, South Glamorgan CF63 2YL, Wales / GB | Application number, filing date | 94301505.7 | 02.03.1994 | [1994/37] | Priority number, date | US19930029503 | 11.03.1993 Original published format: US 29503 | [1994/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0614658 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0614658 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/043, A61K7/027 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
A61K8/342 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61Q1/06 (EP,US);
Y10S424/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/37] | A61K7/48, A61K7/043 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/37] | Title | German: | Silikon enthaltende kosmetische Zusammensetzung für die Lippenpflege | [1994/37] | English: | Silicone containing lip care cosmetic composition | [1994/37] | French: | Composition cosmétique contenant de la silicone pour le soin des lèvres | [1994/37] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 12.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/04] | 27.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/04] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.05.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH03264510 ; | [A]EP0310903 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 2 *; | [A]EP0407089 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,17 *; | [D]US5017221 (LEGROW GARY E [US], et al); | [A]EP0435464 (DOW CORNING [US]); | [Y]US5093111 (BAKER CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * examples 1-3 *; | [XY]EP0495596 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 2, line 1 - line 4; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2,3; | [A]EP0511092 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 1-4; claim 7 *; | [DA]US5160494 (KRZYSIK DUANE G [US], et al); | [X] - JEAN PAUL DISERVI, "Evolution de la chimie des silicones", PARFUMS COSMETIQUES AROMES, PARIS(FRANCE), no. 79, pages 63 - 68 [X] 1 * page 65, column 2 * | [X] - ANON., "Organo-Polysiloxane für kosmetische Produkte", SEIFEN ÖLE FETTE WACHSE, AUGSBURG (GERMANY), (19870507), vol. 113, no. 8, pages 264 - 266 [X] 1 * page 264 * | [A] - B. GRÜNING ET AL., "Neuartige Emulsionen mit siliziumorganischen Copolymeren als Emulgatoren", TENSIDE SURFACTANTS DETERGENTS, MUNCHEN (GERMANY), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 78 - 83, XP000262468 [A] 1 * page 78 * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 02, Database accession no. 92-013550, & JPH03264510 A 19911125 (SHISEIDO KK) [DA] * abstract * |