EP0618236 - Method for recovering cyclodextrin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Shokuhin Kako Co., Ltd. No. 4-1, 3-chome, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states Nihon Shokuhin Kako Co., Ltd. No. 4-1, 3-chome, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Nobuyuki 1-25-6, Higashiooba, Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Mikio 110-23, Miyashita Fuji-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Sumiyoshi, Hideyuki 2954, Imaizumi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Woodman, Derek, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Woodman, Derek, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 94302305.1 | 30.03.1994 | [1994/40] | Priority number, date | JP19930096887 | 31.03.1993 Original published format: JP 9688793 | JP19930223776 | 17.08.1993 Original published format: JP 22377693 | [1994/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0618236 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0618236 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618236 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/16 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
C08B37/0012 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Cyclodextrin | [1994/40] | English: | Method for recovering cyclodextrin | [1994/40] | French: | Procédé pour récupérer cyclodextrine | [1994/40] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1995 | Examination requested [1996/07] | 16.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0525194 ; | [Y]GB1238001 (ROUSSEL-UCLAF) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, lines 20-27 *; | [Y]FR2457900 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * page 12, lines 20-31 *; | [Y]EP0440538 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, lines 57-59 *; | [A]EP0475451 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KALKSTICKSTOFF [DE]) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 10, no. 93, Database accession no. 080422, & JPH0525194 A 00000000 (NIPPON SHOKUHIN KAKO) [A] * abstract * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930614), vol. 17, no. 309 [ ] * abstract * |