EP0629071 - Apparatus for connecting a computer to a telephone system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heredia, Rafael 18 Ivyhill Drive Aberdeen, NJ 07747 / US | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | [1994/50] | Application number, filing date | 94303522.0 | 18.05.1994 | [1994/50] | Priority number, date | US19930072900 | 07.06.1993 Original published format: US 72900 | [1994/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0629071 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP);
H04M11/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/50] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Anschliessen eines Komputers an ein Telefonsystem | [1994/50] | English: | Apparatus for connecting a computer to a telephone system | [1994/50] | French: | Dispositif pour connecter un calculateur à un système téléphonique | [1994/50] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 15.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/09] | 29.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1996/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0473297 (AT&T) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 19 * * column 3, line 32 - line 52 * * column 6, line 11 - line 14 * [Y] 6-9; | [X]JPH04104646 ; | [YD]EP0434231 (HEWLETT-PACKARD) [YD] 6-8 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line 31 - line 34 * * column 3, line 1 - line 26 * * column 3, line 38 - line 50 *; | US5043721 [ ]; | [Y]US5200991 (MOTOYANAGI) [Y] 9 * column 2, line 51 - line 66 * * column 3, line 25 - line 39 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 4 * * column 4, line 26 - line 36 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920724), vol. 16, no. 344, Database accession no. (E - 1239), & JP04104646 A 19920407 (HONDA TETSUJI) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * |