|
09.01.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2007 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.03.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.01.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.2006 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2006 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
51 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
08.12.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
04.12.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
36 |
|
25.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.07.2003 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2003 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2003 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2003 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2003 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
07.10.2002 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.2002 |
Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
06.09.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
01.06.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2001 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Document filed by the applicant/proprietor/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2001 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2001 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.1999 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.1999 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.07.1999 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.1999 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.10.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.10.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.07.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.1997 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.1997 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1996 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1995 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.10.1994 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.1994 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.1994 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.1994 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.1994 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
08.08.1994 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
11.07.1994 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
11.07.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |