|
20.05.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.11.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2003 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.07.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
24.06.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2001 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.09.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.08.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2000 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.07.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.05.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.09.1999 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.1999 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.08.1999 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.08.1999 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.1999 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.1999 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.04.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.02.1999 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.02.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.10.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.09.1998 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.1998 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
20.07.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |