|
24.01.2003 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2002 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2001 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2001 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
09.08.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
09.08.2001 |
Statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2001 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1999 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1999 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.1998 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.07.1998 |
Notice of appeal/statement of grounds |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.1998 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.1998 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1998 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.1998 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.1998 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.04.1998 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.1998 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.10.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.10.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
24.10.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.09.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.03.1996 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.1995 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1994 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1994 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1994 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.07.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |