EP0659401 - Semi-paste oral preparations comprising povidone-iodine, potassium iodide and a sugar alcohol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. 2, avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | [2008/25] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states Euro-Celtique S.A. 122 Boulevard de la Petrusse Luxemburg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masayuki, Hattori, c/o Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. Pharmaceutical Research Lab., 760 Morooka-cho Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Akiko, Kojima, c/o Meiji Seika Kaisha Ltd. Pharmaceutical Research Lab., 760 Morooka-cho Kohoku-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2003/51] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk, 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2001/20] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1995/26] | Lamb, John Baxter MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 94309550.5 | 20.12.1994 | [1995/26] | Priority number, date | JP19930323653 | 22.12.1993 Original published format: JP 32365393 | [1995/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659401 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/16, A61K33/18, A61K31/70, A61K31/79, // (A61K33/18, 31:79, 31:70) | [1995/26] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/79 (EP,US);
A61K33/18 (EP,US);
A61K8/20 (EP,US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K33/18, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/26] | Title | German: | Halbpastöse orale Zubereitung, enthaltend Povidon-Iod, Kaliumjodid und einen Zuckeralkohol | [1995/26] | English: | Semi-paste oral preparations comprising povidone-iodine, potassium iodide and a sugar alcohol | [1995/26] | French: | Préparation orale semipâteuse contenant de la povidone-iode, de d'iodure de potassium et un alcool de sucre | [1995/26] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 13.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.12.2010 | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/42] | 12.06.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/42] | 14.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DPY]JPH061713 ; | [Y]JPS5636408 ; | [Y]US4357314 (LYNCH MATTHEW J) [Y] 1,2 * column A; claim . *; | [Y]GB2142536 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [Y] 1,2* abstract *; | [Y]EP0381483 (TOWA CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * page 6, line 51 - page 7, line 3; claim - * | [Y] - STN INTERNATIONAL, KARLSRUHE. FILE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS. AN=117:198275 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [D] - JP-A-4173726 | [DPY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 18, no. 198, Database accession no. (C - 1187), & JP06001713 A 00000000 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA LTD) [DPY] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - STN INTERNATIONAL, KARLSRUHE. FILE CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS. AN=81:140799 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [D] - JP-A-49031832 | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 81-37437D [21], & JPS5636408 A 00000000 (LION CORP) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * |