EP0612051 - Method for manufacturing a sleeve-shaped-information support, and containers with such sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/34] | Sleeve-shaped-information support, method for its manufacture and containers with such sleeve | ||
[1997/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DECOMATIC S.A. B.P.49 F-38290 La Verpillière / FR | [1994/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allegre, André 62 Chemin du Bois de Serres F-69570 Dardilly / FR | [1994/34] | Representative(s) | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1995/34] | Bernasconi, Jean, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1994/34] | Bernasconi, Jean Cabinet Bernasconi et Vigier 13 boulevard des Batignolles F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 94400275.7 | 09.02.1994 | [1994/34] | Priority number, date | FR19930001906 | 19.02.1993 Original published format: FR 9301906 | [1994/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0612051 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0612051 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/02, B65D65/00 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
B29C53/38 (EP,US);
B65D25/36 (EP,US);
B65D65/00 (EP,US);
G09F3/0289 (EP,US);
Y10S493/961 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/34] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für Hülsförmiger-Informationsträger, und Behälters mit einer solchen Hülse | [1997/04] | English: | Method for manufacturing a sleeve-shaped-information support, and containers with such sleeve | [1997/04] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un manchon-support d'informations, et récipients munis d'un tel manchon | [1997/04] |
Former [1994/34] | Hülsförmiger-Informationsträger, Herstellungsverfahren dafür und Behälters mit einer solchen Hülse | ||
Former [1994/34] | Sleeve-shaped-information support, method for its manufacture and containers with such sleeve | ||
Former [1994/34] | Manchon-support d'informations, son procédé de fabrication et récipients munis d'un tel manchon | Examination procedure | 16.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 22.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]FR1043230 (P G RIEBER & SON AS) [DX] 1-3,5,7,12,13* the whole document *; | [DX]DE3924790 (SCHAEFER ETIKETTEN [DE]) [DX] 1-3,5,7,12,13 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO9202421 (SIMONE RONALD ALAN [CA]) [DX] 1-3,5,7,12,13 * the whole document * |