EP0636453 - Speed protecting circuit for a weight balancing piston [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORANT DEVELOPPEMENT Société à Responsabilité Limitée : 17, rue Fernand Pelloutier F-69200 Venissieux / FR | [1995/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chardenoux, Bernard Antoine Hameau de Trion, 52, Avenue Barthélémy Buyer F-69009 Lyon / FR | [1995/05] | Representative(s) | Thibault, Jean-Marc Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Thibault, Jean-Marc Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 F-69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 94420216.7 | 26.07.1994 | [1995/05] | Priority number, date | FR19930009465 | 26.07.1993 Original published format: FR 9309465 | [1995/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0636453 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/00, B23Q5/58, G05D13/30 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
B23Q11/0028 (EP);
B23Q5/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [1995/05] | Title | German: | Geschwindigkeitschutzschaltung für Gewichsausgleichzylinder | [1995/05] | English: | Speed protecting circuit for a weight balancing piston | [1995/05] | French: | Dispositif de sécurité équipant un vérin d'équilibrage d'une charge et fonctionnant à partir d'une information sur la vitesse de déplacement de la tige du vérin | [1995/05] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 01.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/33] | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4574924 (WABCO) [A] 1,7 * column 1, line 6 - column 1, line 12; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3933759 (RISCHE) [A] 1,7 * column 6, line 46 - column 6, line 53 *; | [A]FR2055038 (AUGSBURG) [A] 1,7 * claim 1 *; | [A]FR2354484 (RENAULT) [A] 1,7 * claim 9 *; | [A]DE8712017U (MAUSER) [A] 1,7 * claim 1 *; | [A]JPS63200904 ; | [A]SU1071824 ; | [A]US2027706 (SCHAUER) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881214), vol. 12, no. 478, Database accession no. (M - 775)<3325> , & JP63200904 A 19880819 (MITSUBISHI) [A] 3 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (19841121), vol. 84, no. 41, Database accession no. 84-254967, & SU1071824 A 00000000 (LENGD) [A] 1 * abstract * |