EP0635290 - Kite with supporting structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAIMPOL VOILES SA ZA de Kerfot 22500 Paimpol / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states PAIMPOL VOILES SA ZA de Kerfot F-22500 Paimpol / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cassagnes, André 66 Avenue Maginot F-94400 Vitry / FR | [1995/04] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Louis François Cabinet Le Guen & Maillet, 38, rue Levavasseur, B.P. 91 35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | Le Guen, Louis François Cabinet Le Guen & Maillet, 38, rue Levavasseur, B.P. 91 F-35802 Dinard Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 94460025.3 | 12.07.1994 | [1995/04] | Priority number, date | FR19930009099 | 23.07.1993 Original published format: FR 9309099 | [1995/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0635290 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0635290 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A63H27/08 | [1995/04] | CPC: |
A63H27/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/04] | Title | German: | Flugdrachen mit Vertiefungsarmierung | [1995/04] | English: | Kite with supporting structure | [1995/04] | French: | Cerf-volant à armatures | [1995/04] | Examination procedure | 04.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/33] | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.09.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.12.1996 | DK | 04.12.1996 | ES | 04.12.1996 | GR | 04.12.1996 | IT | 04.12.1996 | NL | 04.12.1996 | PT | 04.03.1997 | SE | 04.03.1997 | BE | 31.07.1997 | CH | 31.07.1997 | LI | 31.07.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 04.12.1996 | |
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
ES | 04.12.1996 | ||
GR | 04.12.1996 | ||
IT | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.07.1997 | ||
LI | 31.07.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 04.12.1996 | |
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
GR | 04.12.1996 | ||
IT | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.07.1997 | ||
LI | 31.07.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 04.12.1996 | |
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
IT | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.07.1997 | ||
LI | 31.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 04.12.1996 | |
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.07.1997 | ||
CH | 31.07.1997 | ||
LI | 31.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/45] | AT | 04.12.1996 | |
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
CH | 31.07.1997 | ||
LI | 31.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 04.12.1996 | |
DK | 04.12.1996 | ||
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 04.12.1996 | |
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
SE | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | AT | 04.12.1996 | |
PT | 04.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 04.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9217624U (UPHOFF) [A] 1* page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,7 * |