|
16.12.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.09.2005 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.2005 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.09.2005 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.08.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.08.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.07.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
65 |
|
27.05.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2005 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2005 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2005 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
18.04.2005 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.05.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2003 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2003 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.05.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.2003 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2003 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2003 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2003 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2003 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.01.2003 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.08.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.08.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.07.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.03.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.01.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.01.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.12.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2001 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2001 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.2001 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.06.2001 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.03.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2001 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.11.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1999 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.08.1999 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.05.1999 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.05.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1999 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.1999 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.04.1999 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.1998 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
02.07.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.1998 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
21.10.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |