|
16.05.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2003 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2002 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2002 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
14 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
19 |
|
22.04.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
21 |
|
19.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.2002 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.2002 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.07.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2001 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.06.2001 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2001 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2001 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.05.2001 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2001 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2001 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2001 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2001 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2000 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2000 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.01.2000 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.03.1999 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.09.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.06.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.06.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
09.10.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.1997 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1997 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1997 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
17.03.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.12.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.1995 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1995 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.1995 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1995 |
Fee equivalent decrease: refund executed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.07.1994 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.1993 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
64 |