|
11.06.2008 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2007 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.01.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.10.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
24.06.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
06.05.2005 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.04.2005 |
Request for change of address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2005 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.12.2004 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
14 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
23.09.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.07.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
28.06.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.10.2002 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.11.2000 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
13.09.2000 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2000 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2000 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.09.1999 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.11.1998 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.11.1998 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.07.1998 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.08.1996 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.1996 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.1996 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.10.1995 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.1995 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1995 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.1995 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.1995 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1995 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1995 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1995 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.08.1995 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
01.08.1995 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.07.1995 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
30.05.1995 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.05.1995 |
Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1994 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.1994 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.1994 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.07.1994 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
07.07.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |