|
04.01.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.2009 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.12.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2009 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2009 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.2009 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2009 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.10.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
10.07.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2009 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.12.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
66 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.07.2008 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.06.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.06.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
24 |
|
24.06.2006 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
36 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
70 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.10.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
38 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
23.09.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
22.09.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
32 |
|
23.11.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2004 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2004 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.10.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.06.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.06.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
131 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
111 |
|
01.03.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.11.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2002 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2002 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.02.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2000 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.1999 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1998 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.1995 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Letter concerning biological material |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.06.1995 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
12.04.1995 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.04.1995 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
08.09.1994 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.1994 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.07.1994 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
160 |
|
21.07.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
21.07.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
92 |