Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0678101 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 602
18.05.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.05.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
24.03.2010 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.02.2006 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.08.2005 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 16
01.07.2005 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 3
30.05.2005 Claims Appeal 2
30.05.2005 Claims Appeal 5
30.05.2005 Claims Appeal 2
30.05.2005 Claims Appeal 2
30.05.2005 Claims Appeal 4
30.05.2005 Claims Appeal 4
30.05.2005 Claims Appeal 2
30.05.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
30.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.05.2005 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.05.2005 Claims Appeal 4
26.05.2005 Claims Appeal 2
26.05.2005 Claims Appeal 2
26.05.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
05.04.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
24.03.2005 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.03.2005 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 1
16.12.2004 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
01.12.2004 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
22.11.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.11.2004 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.10.2004 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
05.10.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
05.10.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 10
04.10.2004 Notice of appeal Appeal 12
13.08.2004 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.08.2004 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.08.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 5
05.08.2004 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
05.08.2004 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 16
05.08.2004 Means of redress Search / examination 1
05.08.2004 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
07.07.2004 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
11.05.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 58
11.05.2004 Annex to a communication Search / examination 14
11.05.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.05.2004 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
11.05.2004 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
14.04.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
14.04.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
14.04.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
14.04.2004 Claims Search / examination 4
14.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 8
14.04.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
14.04.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
14.04.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
14.04.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
14.04.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
14.04.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
14.04.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
14.04.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
13.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 59
08.12.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
03.12.2003 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.11.2003 Annex to a communication Search / examination 9
28.11.2003 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 8
25.11.2003 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
05.11.2003 General enquiry Search / examination 1
03.11.2003 General enquiry Search / examination 1
04.10.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
04.10.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
03.10.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
07.08.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
31.07.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.07.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.06.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
03.06.2002 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
03.06.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.05.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
02.04.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
02.04.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.08.2000 Claims Search / examination 4
02.08.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
07.04.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
11.08.1997 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
03.06.1997 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.06.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.06.1997 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 5
13.09.1995 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
11.08.1995 Claims Search / examination 4
11.08.1995 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
08.09.1994 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.07.1994 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
21.07.1994 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 104
21.07.1994 Priority document Search / examination 44